Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study the Provision of Health Care Coverage to Uninsured Marylanders
Sponsored by
Delegates Kelly, Anderson, Angel, Atterbeary, B. Barnes, D. Barnes, Barron, Brooks, Campos, Carr, Cullison, Davis, Ebersole, Fennell, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frick, Frush, Gaines, Gilchrist, Glenn, Gutierrez, Hayes, Haynes, Hettleman, Hill, Hixson, Holmes, Jones, Korman, Kramer, Lam, Lierman, Lisanti, Luedtke, McIntosh, A. Miller, Moon, Morales, Oaks, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Reznik, S. Robinson, Sample-Hughes, Smith, Sydnor, Tarlau, Turner, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Vaughn, Waldstreicher, A. Washington, M. Washington, K. Young, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study the Provision of Health Care Coverage to Uninsured Marylanders; providing for the composition, chair, staffing, and duties of the Task Force; establishing the purpose of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to submit a final report on its recommendations and finding to the Senate Finance Committee and the House Health and Government Operations Committee on or before January 1, 2017; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0471
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/08/2015 4/09/2015 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM