Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Lead Remediation Credit
Sponsored by
Delegates Mosby, Walker, Anderson, Conaway, Glenn, Haynes, Ivey, Jalisi, R. Lewis, Turner, Ebersole, Feldmark, Guyton, Luedtke, Palakovich Carr, Patterson, Shoemaker, Smith, Washington, and Wilkins
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 2:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Allowing an individual or a corporation to claim a credit against the State income tax for certain costs incurred for an approved lead hazard reduction project for qualifying property located in Baltimore City; providing for the calculation of the credit; providing for the submission of proposals for lead hazard reduction projects to the Department of Housing and Community Development for approval; limiting to $250,000 the total amount of credits that the Department may approve for any fiscal year; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax - Lead Remediation Credit
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {285960/1 Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Income Tax - Lead Remediation Credit
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax - Lead Remediation Credit
House 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/28/2019 3/28/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/28/2019 3/20/2019 Favorable with Amendments {285960/1 Adopted 55
House 3/28/2019 3/20/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55
Text - Third - Income Tax - Lead Remediation Credit
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Third Reading Passed (130-0) 56
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Referred Rules 58
Senate 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Hearing 4/04 at 2:30 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-749 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM