Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment - Wage Payment and Collection - General Contractor Liability
Sponsored by
Delegate Adams
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the circumstances under which general contractors are jointly and severally liable for violations of the wage payment and collection law by subcontractors; prohibiting an obligation of contract right from being impaired by the Act; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0831
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Labor and Employment - Wage Payment and Collection - General Contractor Liability
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2020 3/09/2020 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:13 PM
Click to return on the top page