Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Physicians - Medical Professional Liability Insurance Coverage - Verification, Publication, and Notification Requirements (Janet's Law)
Sponsored by
Delegates Miele, Cluster, and Bromwell
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 770
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a specified physician to provide the State Board of Physicians with verification or documentation within 25 business days after the physician receives the request from the Board that the physician maintains medical professional liability insurance; requiring the public profile of specified licensees of the Board to include information on whether the licensee maintains medical professional liability insurance; requiring each licensee practicing medicine to provide a specified written notification; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0195
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Physicians - Licensure - Liability Coverage (Janet's Law)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {236286/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Delegate Morhaim) Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Delegate Morhaim) Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/19/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {914137/1 Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 770
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Physicians - Licensure - Liability Coverage (Janet's Law)
House 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/18/2017 3/18/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Favorable with Amendments {236286/1 Adopted 49
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Delegate Morhaim) Adopted 49
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Delegate Morhaim) Adopted 49
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49
Text - Third - State Board of Physicians - Medical Professional Liability Insurance Coverage - Verification, Publication, and Notification Requirements (Janet's Law)
House 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 51
Senate 3/21/2017 3/19/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable with Amendments {914137/1 Adopted 60
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 61
House 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 House Concurs Senate Amendments 67
House 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 67
House 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - State Board of Physicians - Medical Professional Liability Insurance Coverage - Verification, Publication, and Notification Requirements (Janet's Law)
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 770
Text - Chapter - State Board of Physicians - Medical Professional Liability Insurance Coverage - Verification, Publication, and Notification Requirements (Janet's Law)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-312.1, 14-411.1, 14-508 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM