Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Women's Late-Term Pregnancy Health Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Ciliberti, Adams, Afzali, Carozza, Cassilly, Folden, Ghrist, Glass, Grammer, Hornberger, Impallaria, Jacobs, Kipke, Krebs, McComas, McDonough, McKay, Metzgar, W. Miller, Morgan, O'Donnell, Parrott, Reilly, Shoemaker, Simonaire, Szeliga, Vogt, and B. Wilson
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that, except in the case of a medical emergency, an abortion may not be performed or induced or be attempted to be performed or induced unless a specified physician makes a specified determination; providing that, except in the case of a medical emergency, an individual may not knowingly perform or induce or attempt to perform or induce an abortion if the probable gestational age of an unborn child is a specified number of weeks; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0511
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   20-217 through 20-225 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM