Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Unlawful Drinking or Possessing an Open Container - Failure to Appear in Court
Sponsored by
Delegates Niemann, Barnes, Gaines, and A. Washington
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Clarifying that a person who is charged with a specified misdemeanor involving unlawful drinking or possessing an open container of an alcoholic beverage and who does not appear in court is subject to a specified penalty.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2014 2/06/2014 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/07/2014 2/07/2014 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/15/2014 3/15/2014 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   19-201 through 19-203, 19-204, 19-301, 19-302 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM