Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Collaborative Reproduction - Orders of Parentage
Sponsored by
Delegate Dumais
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a party to a gestational carrier agreement to file a petition for parentage under specified circumstances; establishing the purposes of the Act; specifying the required contents of a petition for parentage; requiring a court to issue an order of parentage under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2016
Legislative Date
2/15/2016
Action
Reassigned to Judiciary
Proceedings
24
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2016
Legislative Date
2/16/2016
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2016 2/10/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/15/2016 2/15/2016 Reassigned to Judiciary 24
House 2/16/2016 2/16/2016 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-901 through 5-903 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM