Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commission to Consider Mental Health-Related Ways to Limit Mass Violence by Individuals with Antisocial Personality Disorders, Depressive Disorders, or Other Mental Illness
Sponsored by
Delegates George, Hixson, Afzali, Anderson, Arora, Aumann, Barnes, Barve, Bates, Beidle, Beitzel, Boteler, Burns, Cane, Carter, Cluster, DeBoy, Donoghue, Eckardt, Elliott, Feldman, Fisher, Frank, Frick, Gilchrist, Glass, Haddaway-Riccio, Hershey, Hogan, Holmes, Hough, Howard, Ivey, Jacobs, James, Kach, K. Kelly, Kipke, Krebs, Lafferty, Love, McComas, McConkey, McDermott, McDonough, McMillan, A. Miller, W. Miller, Minnick, Nathan-Pulliam, Norman, O'Donnell, Olszewski, Otto, Parrott, Proctor, Ready, Reznik, B. Robinson, Schuh, Schulz, Serafini, Sophocleus, Stein, Stifler, Stocksdale, Stukes, Szeliga, F. Turner, Valentino-Smith, Vitale, Walker, Weir, Wilson, Wood, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a Commission to Consider Mental Health-Related Ways to Limit Mass Violence by Individuals with Antisocial Personality Disorders, Depressive Disorders, or Other Mental Illness; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Commission; requiring the Commission to study and make recommendations regarding the prevention of mass violence perpetrated by individuals with mental illness; requiring the Commission to report its findings and recommendations on or before December 31, 2013; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/23/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/07/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/21/2013 3/23/2013 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM