Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Anne Arundel County - School Board - Membership
Sponsored by
Delegate McConkey
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that members of the Anne Arundel County Board of Education be elected and appointed, as specified; repealing provisions relating to a retention election for specified appointed members of the county board; establishing procedures for the election and appointment of members of the county board; providing for a nonpartisan election for specified members of the county board; providing for the termination of the terms of specified members of the county board; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0107
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0580 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
(   3-108, 3-110, 3-114, 3-2A-01 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM
Click to return on the top page