Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Statute of Limitations - Residential Leases Signed Under Seal
Sponsored by
Delegates Waldstreicher, Barve, and Holmes
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Clarifying the time period within which a civil action on a residential lease that has been signed under seal must be filed; and declaring that it is the intent of the General Assembly to clarify that an action for rent arrears under any kind of residential lease must be filed in compliance with specified provisions of law.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/13/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {940212/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/13/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-1)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2016 2/10/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/15/2016 3/16/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2016 3/13/2016 Favorable with Amendments {940212/1 Report Adopted 45
House 3/16/2016 3/13/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
House 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Third Reading Passed (137-1) 50
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 48A
Senate 3/23/2016 3/23/2016 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/06/2016 4/07/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM