Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County - State's Attorney - Salary PG 310-14
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 245
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Increasing the annual salary of the State's Attorney of Prince George's County to $199,000; providing that the Act does not apply to the salary or compensation of the State's Attorney of Prince George's County while serving before October 1, 2014; providing that a specified limitation does not apply to a specified individual; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (118-13)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {628474/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (124-5)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2014
Legislative Date
4/14/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 245
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2014 2/06/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/12/2014 3/13/2014 Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
House 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 46
House 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Second Reading Passed 46
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Third Reading Passed (118-13) 47
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 47
Senate 3/19/2014 3/19/2014 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/02/2014 4/03/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Favorable with Amendments {628474/1 Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0) 62
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 House Concur - Senate Amendments 68
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Third Reading Passed (124-5) 68
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Passed Enrolled 68
Post Passage 4/14/2014 4/14/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 245
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM