Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
CINA, Guardianship, Adoption, Custody, and Visitation - Disability of Parent, Guardian, Custodian, or Party
Sponsored by
Delegate Rosenberg
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing that, in any custody or visitation proceeding, the disability of a party is relevant only to the extent that the court finds, based on evidence in the record, that the disability affects the best interest of the child; requiring, in a specified custody or visitation proceeding, the party alleging that the disability of the other party affects the best interest of the child to bear a specified burden of proof; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Rules
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {122914/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
66A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
66A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
63A
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2016 2/10/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/08/2016 4/09/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Favorable with Amendments {122914/1 Report Adopted 66A
House 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66A
House 4/09/2016 4/04/2016 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 First Reading Senate Rules 63A
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-338, 5-350, 5-3A-35, 5-3B-19, 5-525, 9-107 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM