Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County - Gaming - Charity Chips PG 307-14
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing in Prince George's County specified volunteer fire departments and organizations that promote the arts and preserve the culture to hold events in which the public may play poker card games; limiting the number of poker events that may be held to one a month; requiring that a permit be obtained from the Prince George's County Department of Environmental Resources before a poker event may be held; specifying requirements to qualify for a permit; specifying the contents of an application for a permit; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1083 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2014 2/06/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-1902, 13-1912, 13-1913 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM