Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Children Exempt From Public School Attendance - Participation in Public High School Clubs and Activities
Sponsored by
Delegates West, Sophocleus, Chang, Aumann, and Valentino-Smith
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring local school systems to allow a specified child who is exempt from public school attendance to participate in specified clubs and activities beginning September 1, 2017; requiring a child who participates in specified activities to participate with a specified high school, meet specified eligibility or tryout criteria, meet equivalent academic requirements, comply with specified standards of performance and behavior, and pay any out-of-pocket expenses incurred by the school due to the child's participation; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Children Exempt From Public School Attendance - Participation in Public High School Clubs and Activities
House 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-124, 7-203.3 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM