Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Electric Companies - Transmission Charges
Sponsored by
Delegate Conaway
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting an electric company from imposing an electric transmission charge on its customers if the electricity was generated at an electric generating facility located in the State that began operation on or after a specified date and was first sold to an electricity supplier located outside the State and then resold through the electric company for distribution in the State.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/07/2013 2/07/2013 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2013 3/19/2013 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM