Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Membership
Sponsored by
Allegany County Delegation
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the membership of the Correctional Officers' Retirement System to include specified individuals serving in specified positions in the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services; providing that specified members of the Correctional Officers' Retirement System who meet specified criteria may receive a normal service retirement allowance that is based on specified creditable service; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0664
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Membership
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/08/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {594765/1 Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Membership
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (141-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/10/2017
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Membership
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Hearing canceled
House 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Hearing 3/02 at 3:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 4/08/2017 4/08/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Favorable with Amendments {594765/1 Adopted 66
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66
Text - Third - Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Membership
House 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (141-0) 67
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Referred Rules 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/10/2017 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM