Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Licensed Pharmacists - Risks of Opioid Addiction - Notifications
Sponsored by
Delegate Kipke
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a licensed pharmacist, if an opioid is dispensed by a licensed pharmacist or an individual engaging in a professional experience program and acting under the direct supervision of a licensed pharmacist, to notify the individual to whom the opioid is dispensed of the risks of opioid addiction; and providing that the notice may be made orally or in writing.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Licensed Pharmacists - Risks of Opioid Addiction - Notifications
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Licensed Pharmacists - Risks of Opioid Addiction - Notifications
House 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/18/2017 3/18/2017 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM