Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Legislation Impacting Local Government Land Use Decisions - Economic Impact Analyses
Sponsored by
Delegates McKay, Beitzel, Buckel, Glass, Krebs, Parrott, Shoemaker, and B. Wilson
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring specified Executive Branch agencies and the Department of Legislative Services to prepare economic impact analyses for specified bills that impact local government land use decisions; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0713
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2015
Legislative Date
2/25/2015
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 2/25/2015 2/25/2015 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-1505.3 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM