Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Residential Real Property - Sales Contracts - Notice of Water and Sewer Charges
Sponsored by
Delegate Holmes
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 638
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Making clarifying changes to a specified notice requirement about water and sewer charges in a contract for the initial sale of residential real property; requiring a contract for the resale of residential real property that is served by public water or wastewater facilities for which deferred water and sewer charges have been established by a recorded covenant or declaration to contain a specified notice; providing for the application of specified provisions of the Act; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0815
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {100019/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {268878/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/19/2016
Legislative Date
5/19/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 638
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2016 2/10/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2016 3/07/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Favorable with Amendments {100019/1 Report Adopted 40
House 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
House 3/14/2016 3/11/2016 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 43A
Senate 3/15/2016 3/15/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 44
Senate 4/01/2016 4/01/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/01/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable with Amendments {268878/1 Report Adopted 57
Senate 4/01/2016 3/28/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57
Senate 4/04/2016 3/29/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0) 58
House 4/06/2016 3/30/2016 House Concur - Senate Amendments 62
House 4/06/2016 3/30/2016 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 62
House 4/06/2016 3/30/2016 Passed Enrolled 62
Post Passage 5/19/2016 5/19/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 638
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-117 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM