Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Qualified Health Plans - Standards
Sponsored by
Delegates Kelly, Bromwell, Cullison, and Morhaim
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering specified requirements for certification as a qualified health plan in the Maryland Health Benefit Exchange; prohibiting a qualified health plan from using a benefit design or implementing a benefit design in a manner that discriminates in a specified manner; prohibiting specified carriers from making specified formulary changes during a specified period; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0834
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/08/2015 4/09/2015 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   31-115, 31-115.1 through 31-115.3, 31-116, 31-119 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM