Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Retail Establishment License
Sponsored by
Delegate Kipke
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Authorizing the Board of License Commissioners of Anne Arundel County to issue a retail establishment license to the owner of a licensed retail establishment; specifying that a retail establishment license authorizes the holder to provide without charge beer, wine, and liquor for consumption on the premises of the retail establishment; requiring the Board to determine the quantity of beer, wine, and liquor that may be served to any one person per day; establishing the amount of a specified fee; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1003 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2014
Legislative Date
2/20/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2014
Legislative Date
2/25/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2014 2/06/2014 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/07/2014 2/07/2014 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/20/2014 2/20/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 2/24/2014 2/25/2014 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-101, 8-202 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM