Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Utilities - Telephone Lifeline Service - Revisions
Sponsored by
Delegate Davis
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 532
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that a specified local telephone company provide "lifeline" to qualifying low-income consumers under specified circumstances; repealing a requirement that a telephone company charge an eligible subscriber a percentage of a specified tariff under specified circumstances; requiring the Department of Human Resources to provide specified information to local telephone companies to the extent allowed by State law in addition to federal law and until specified eligibility is determined; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0649
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2017
Legislative Date
2/07/2017
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Utilities - Telephone Lifeline Service - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
2/28/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Utilities - Telephone Lifeline Service - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2017
Legislative Date
3/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/03/2017
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 532
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Public Utilities - Telephone Lifeline Service - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Public Utilities - Telephone Lifeline Service - Revisions
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 2/28/2017 2/28/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 35
Text - Third - Public Utilities - Telephone Lifeline Service - Revisions
House 3/02/2017 3/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 37
Senate 3/03/2017 3/03/2017 Referred Finance 36
Senate 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/27/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/28/2017 3/24/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 53
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 54
House 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Returned Passed 60
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 532
Text - Chapter - Public Utilities - Telephone Lifeline Service - Revisions
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM