Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Mental Health Facilities - Staffing Committee and Plan
Sponsored by
Delegates Acevero, Pena-Melnyk, Bhandari, Bridges, Charles, Conaway, W. Fisher, Hill, Ivey, Lehman, R. Lewis, Moon, Mosby, Proctor, Smith, Stewart, Valentino-Smith, and Wilkins
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring each State mental health facility to establish a staffing committee to create a staffing plan for nurses working in the State facility; providing for the membership of a staffing committee; providing for the contents of a staffing plan; requiring a staffing committee to convene by November 30, 2019 and at least once during each 3-month period thereafter for a certain purpose; requiring a State facility to submit a certain staffing plan to the Maryland Department of Health; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Mental Health Facilities - Staffing Committee and Plan
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - State Mental Health Facilities - Staffing Committee and Plan
House 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Hearing canceled
House 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.
House 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM