Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Disclosures to Purchasers on Resale of Unit or Lot - Limitation on Fees
Sponsored by
Delegates McMillan, Davis, and Holmes
Status
In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Limiting the amount of the fee that a condominium council of unit owners may charge a unit owner to furnish a certificate with the information necessary for the unit owner to comply with specified resale disclosure requirements; providing that a council of unit owners is entitled to charge specified fees for an inspection of a unit and for ensuring the completion of specified inspection and preparation and delivery of a specified certificate within 14 days after a written request by a unit owner; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0412 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {620012/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/24/2015
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {188776/1
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Special Order until 4/11 (Senator Norman) Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/13/2015 2/13/2015 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 Favorable with Amendments {620012/1 Report Adopted 50
House 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
House 3/23/2015 3/21/2015 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 51
Senate 3/24/2015 3/21/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 48
Senate 3/24/2015 3/24/2015 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/09/2015 4/10/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable with Amendments {188776/1 61
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Committee Amendment Adopted 61
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Special Order until 4/11 (Senator Norman) Adopted 61
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted 62
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 63
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-135, 11B-106 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM