Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
One Maryland Economic Development Tax Credits - Business Incubators, Enterprise Zones, and Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zones
Sponsored by
Delegates A. Washington, Lierman, D. Barnes, C. Howard, Simonaire, Turner, and Walker
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering specified eligibility criteria for specified credits under the One Maryland Economic Development Tax Credit to include specified persons who establish or expand in specified areas a business facility that, for business incubators, creates a specified aggregate number of qualified positions at the facility under specified circumstances; authorizing specified business incubators to claim a refund of specified project tax credits or start-up tax credits; applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2016; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0364
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - One Maryland Economic Development Tax Credits - Business Incubators, Enterprise Zones, and Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zones
House 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-401, 6-402, 6-403, 6-404, 6-405 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM