Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Physicians - Invasive Cardiovascular Professionals
Sponsored by
Delegate Cullison
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing certain registered cardiovascular invasive specialists to perform certain functions; requiring a registered cardiovascular invasive specialist to be supervised by a licensed physician; establishing that the failure of certain licensed physicians to provide proper supervision constitutes professional misconduct; requiring the State Board of Physicians to keep a list of all cardiovascular invasive specialists and adopt certain regulations; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1087
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1025 Session: 2005 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Board of Physicians - Invasive Cardiovascular Professionals
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2018
Legislative Date
2/21/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2018
Legislative Date
2/21/2018
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2018
Legislative Date
2/22/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2018
Legislative Date
2/22/2018
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2018
Legislative Date
2/23/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2018
Legislative Date
2/23/2018
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - State Board of Physicians - Invasive Cardiovascular Professionals
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/21/2018 2/21/2018 Hearing canceled
House 2/21/2018 2/21/2018 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/22/2018 2/22/2018 Hearing canceled
House 2/22/2018 2/22/2018 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/23/2018 2/23/2018 Hearing canceled
House 2/23/2018 2/23/2018 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/20/2018 3/20/2018 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-5G-01 through 14-5G-05 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM