Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety and Policing Workgroup - Recommendations
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Workgroup on Public Safety and Policing) and Delegates Anderson, Atterbeary, Clippinger, Folden, Hayes, Jackson, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, B. Wilson, and C. Wilson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 519
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting retaliatory personnel action against a law enforcement officer who discloses specified information; authorizing the appointment to an administrative hearing board a member of the public who has received specified training; establishing the Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission as an independent commission in the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services; establishing the Community Law Enforcement Program Fund; requiring the Governor to include an appropriation to the Fund of $500,000 annually; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016, October 1, 2016
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {362818/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Special Order until later today (Delegate Folden) Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Folden) {293226/1 Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (92-44)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/20/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {938871/2 Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-1)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Delegates Anderson, Atterbeary, and Vallario
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Senate Refuses to Recede
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Senators Zirkin, McFadden, and Hough
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
71
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (90-49)
Proceedings
71
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-1)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/19/2016
Legislative Date
5/19/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 519
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2016 2/10/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/19/2016 3/21/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Favorable with Amendments {362818/1 Report Adopted 50
House 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Special Order until later today (Delegate Folden) Adopted 50
House 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate Folden) {293226/1 Adopted 50
House 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
House 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 Third Reading Passed (92-44) 51
Senate 3/22/2016 3/20/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 49
Senate 4/07/2016 4/08/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Favorable with Amendments {938871/2 Report Adopted 62
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-1) 63
House 4/09/2016 4/04/2016 House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments 67
House 4/09/2016 4/04/2016 House Requests Senate Recede 67
House 4/09/2016 4/04/2016 Conference Committee Appointed 67
House 4/09/2016 4/04/2016 Delegates Anderson, Atterbeary, and Vallario 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/04/2016 Senate Refuses to Recede 64
Senate 4/11/2016 4/04/2016 Conference Committee Appointed 64
Senate 4/11/2016 4/04/2016 Senators Zirkin, McFadden, and Hough 64
House 4/11/2016 4/08/2016 Conference Committee Report Adopted 71
House 4/11/2016 4/08/2016 Third Reading Passed (90-49) 71
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Conference Committee Report Adopted 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-1) 67
House 4/11/2016 4/08/2016 Passed Enrolled 67
Post Passage 5/19/2016 5/19/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 519
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-103, 3-104, 3-107, 3-201, 3-202, 3-203, 3-204, 3-206 through 3-209, 3-514 through 3-519, 4-601 through 4-603 )
(   10-207 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM