Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Services Initiative - Vision Care for Low-Income Children
Sponsored by
Delegate Lierman
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Department of Health, under certain circumstances, to establish a certain Health Services Initiative; requiring the Health Services Initiative to apply to certain individuals, require certain schools to provide certain services, offer services from certain providers, and require the Department to reimburse certain providers in a certain manner for certain services; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0940
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Health Services Initiative - Vision Care for Low-Income Children
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2020
Legislative Date
2/14/2020
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health Services Initiative - Vision Care for Low-Income Children
House 2/14/2020 2/14/2020 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:16 PM
Click to return on the top page