Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
County Boards of Education - Spending - Reporting Requirement
Sponsored by
Delegates Cain, Bagnall, and Rogers
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring each county board of education to provide a report to the State Department of Education by October 1, 2020 and every 3 years thereafter, on the amount of State, local, and federal funds spent per student for certain students at each school; requiring the Department to submit a certain report to the General Assembly by certain dates; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - County Boards of Education - Spending - Reporting Requirement
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2019
Legislative Date
2/27/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - County Boards of Education - Spending - Reporting Requirement
House 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/27/2019 2/27/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-120 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM