Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Schools - Thirsty Kids Act
Sponsored by
Delegates A. Miller, Carr, Ebersole, Fennell, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frush, Luedtke, Metzgar, Moon, Tarlau, and M. Washington
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring each public school to make available free, unlimited, potable drinking water for each student throughout the school day, include a reusable water bottle on the school supplies list for each student in kindergarten through grade 12, and provide specified cups for drinking water in specified locations; and requiring the State Department of Education to encourage each county board to develop a plan to promote the consumption of drinking water, the use of reusable water bottles, and weekly cleaning of water bottles.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0296
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
2/13/2015 Text - First - Public Schools - Thirsty Kids Act
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-437 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM