Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Juvenile Law – Witnesses – Body Attachment
Sponsored by
Delegates Clippinger, Anderson, Lierman, Rosenberg, and Sydnor
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 783
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the juvenile court, in a certain case in which jurisdiction is transferred from a court exercising criminal jurisdiction, to issue body attachments for witnesses as provided by a certain Maryland Rule.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0861
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Juvenile Law – Witnesses – Body Attachment
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/10/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Juvenile Law – Witnesses – Body Attachment
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/11/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-1)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {508070/1 Adopted
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-3)
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Atterbeary, Proctor and Cluster)
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Atterbeary, Proctor and Cluster)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Senate Refuses Recede
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Brochin, Ramirez and Ready)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Senate Refuses Recede
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Brochin, Ramirez and Ready)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Conference Committee Report {513521/1 Adopted
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Conference Committee Report {513521/1 Adopted
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-1)
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Juvenile Law – Witnesses – Body Attachment
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 783
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Juvenile Law – Witnesses – Body Attachment
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Juvenile Law – Witnesses – Body Attachment
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Juvenile Law – Witnesses – Body Attachment
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Third Reading Passed (135-1) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Referred Judicial Proceedings 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/03/2018 3/29/2018 Favorable with Amendments {508070/1 Adopted 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2018 3/29/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2018 3/30/2018 Third Reading Passed (43-3) 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 House Requests Senate Recede 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Atterbeary, Proctor and Cluster) 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 House Requests Senate Recede 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Atterbeary, Proctor and Cluster) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Senate Refuses Recede 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Brochin, Ramirez and Ready) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 Senate Refuses Recede 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Brochin, Ramirez and Ready) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Conference Committee Report {513521/1 Adopted 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Conference Committee Report {513521/1 Adopted 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Third Reading Passed (43-1) 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Juvenile Law – Witnesses – Body Attachment
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 783
Text - Chapter - Juvenile Law – Witnesses – Body Attachment
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page