Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Auxiliary Winery Permit
Sponsored by
Delegates Mautz, Adams, Barkley, Buckel, Jacobs, McComas, Otto, Rose, and B. Wilson
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing an auxiliary winery permit; authorizing the Comptroller to issue the permit to a holder of a Class 4 limited winery permit for use at a single location off the licensed premises in the State, subject to specified restrictions; prohibiting the Comptroller from issuing more than 25 permits in the State and more than one permit per license holder; authorizing the holder of the permit to exercise the privileges with specified exceptions that are allowed at the premises for which the holder's Class 4 license is issued; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0718
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0520 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2017
Legislative Date
2/07/2017
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Alcoholic Beverages - Auxiliary Winery Permit
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {873992/1 Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Alcoholic Beverages - Auxiliary Winery Permit
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-9)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Alcoholic Beverages - Auxiliary Winery Permit
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/24/2017 3/24/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/24/2017 3/21/2017 Favorable with Amendments {873992/1 Adopted 55
House 3/24/2017 3/21/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55
Text - Third - Alcoholic Beverages - Auxiliary Winery Permit
House 3/28/2017 3/23/2017 Third Reading Passed (131-9) 57
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Referred Rules 54
Senate 4/05/2017 4/05/2017 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM