Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Criminal Gangs - Database (Fair and Accurate Gang Database Act)
Sponsored by
Delegate Washington
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a certain law enforcement agency to provide certain notice in order for the law enforcement agency to designate the person as a criminal gang member or criminal gang associate in a shared gang database; requiring a certain notice to contain certain information; providing that a certain person may submit a certain request regarding criminal gang status; requiring a certain law enforcement agency to provide certain information under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Public Safety - Criminal Gangs - Database (Fair and Accurate Gang Database Act)
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/27/2019 3/27/2019 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-801 through 3-805 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM