Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Certifying Providers - Referrals
Sponsored by
Delegate Glenn
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 599
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting referral of a patient to a certifying provider by certain persons or entities.
Committees
Opposite:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1063
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {516681/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-2)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 599
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Certifying Providers - Referrals
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/17/2018 3/17/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {516681/1 Adopted 47A
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47A
Text - Third - Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Certifying Providers - Referrals
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Third Reading Passed (135-2) 48
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Finance 48B
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/22/2018 3/22/2018 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/22/2018 3/20/2018 Favorable Adopted 51
Senate 3/22/2018 3/20/2018 Second Reading Passed 51
Senate 3/23/2018 3/21/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 52
House 3/26/2018 3/19/2018 Returned Passed 53
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 599
Text - Chapter - Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Certifying Providers - Referrals
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM