Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Electricity - Consumer Relations - Smart Meters
Sponsored by
Delegates Glass, Aumann, Boteler, Cullison, Dwyer, Elliott, Fisher, Frank, Gutierrez, Hogan, Kipke, McComas, McDonough, O'Donnell, Oaks, Parrott, Ready, Smigiel, Sophocleus, and Stocksdale
Status
In the House - Referred to interim study by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring an electric company to give specified written notice to specified customers before installing smart meters on a customer's premises under specified circumstances; specifying the contents of a specified notice; establishing a process by which a specified customer shall be deemed to have given permission to an electric company to install a smart meter; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Referred to interim study by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/07/2013 2/07/2013 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2013 3/19/2013 Referred to interim study by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM