Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Insurance - Guaranteed Automobile Protection - Liability
Sponsored by
Delegates Cox and Boteler
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that the Maryland Consumer Protection Act applies to certain professional services of a certain insurance company or insurance producer with respect to certain activities in connection with guaranteed automobile protection insurance policies; providing that a certain insurer that is found to have knowingly violated certain provisions of law with respect to a guaranteed automobile protection insurance policy is liable for certain amounts to certain persons; and defining "guaranteed automobile protection insurance policy".
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Insurance - Guaranteed Automobile Protection - Liability
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Insurance - Guaranteed Automobile Protection - Liability
House 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-104 )
(   1-101, 27-102, 27-106 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM