Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property Tax - Valuation of Real Property - Internet Database
Sponsored by
Delegates McComas, Afzali, McDonough, and Stocksdale
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing a requirement that the State Department of Assessments and Taxation maintain a database, available to the public on the Department's Web site, that relates to the valuation of specified real property in the State and includes specified information about each property; requiring the Department to maintain a database, available to the public on the Department's Web site, of assessment worksheets and cards that relate to the valuation of real property in the State; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0553
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2014 2/06/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-201 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM