Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Oncologists - Dispensing and Insurance Coverage of Orally Administered Cancer Chemotherapy
Sponsored by
Delegates Hill, Krebs, Lam, Morhaim, Turner, and Waldstreicher
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Exempting a specified physician from the prohibition on dispensing specified prescriptions when the physician has a substantial financial interest in a pharmacy under specified circumstances; authorizing a licensed physician to personally prepare and dispense a prescription written by a specified physician in the same group practice; exempting specified associations that include an oncologist from the prohibition on associating as a partner, a co-owner, or an employee of a specified pharmacy; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0992
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Oncologists - Dispensing and Insurance Coverage of Orally Administered Cancer Chemotherapy
House 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/31/2017 3/31/2017 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-102, 12-313, 12-401, 12-6B-09, 14-404 )
(   15-112, 15-846, 15-847 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM