Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Earned Income Tax Credit - Expansion
Sponsored by
Delegates Hixson, Lierman, Platt, Turner, Walker, A. Washington, M. Washington, Afzali, D. Barnes, Buckel, Ebersole, Fennell, Hornberger, C. Howard, Kaiser, Long, Luedtke, Metzgar, Patterson, Reilly, Shoemaker, Simonaire, and Tarlau
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the calculation of the Maryland earned income tax credit to allow specified individuals without qualifying children to claim an increased credit; expanding eligibility of the credit to allow specified individuals without qualifying children to claim the credit; allowing specified individuals 21 years of age and older to claim the credit; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2016; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0294
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {295364/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-8)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2016 2/11/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2016 3/17/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/17/2016 3/15/2016 Favorable with Amendments {295364/1 Report Adopted 47
House 3/17/2016 3/15/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
House 3/18/2016 3/16/2016 Third Reading Passed (130-8) 48
Senate 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation 47A
Senate 3/23/2016 3/23/2016 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/24/2016 3/24/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/24/2016 3/24/2016 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-704 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM