Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Voter Registration Act of 2015
Sponsored by
Delegates Hixson, Gutierrez, C. Howard, A. Miller, Pena-Melnyk, Rosenberg, and Turner
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring specified voter registration agencies to implement a fully automated voter registration system on or before July 1, 2016; requiring specified voter registration agencies to submit specified reports to specified committees of the General Assembly on or before specified dates that include specified information about the work of the voter registration agencies to register voters; requiring public institutions of higher education to implement a fully automated voter registration system on or before July 1, 2016; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
2/13/2015 Text - First - Voter Registration Act of 2015
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-204 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM