Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workers' Compensation - Baltimore County Deputy Sheriff
Sponsored by
Baltimore County Delegation
Status
In the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing for enhanced workers' compensation benefits for a deputy sheriff in Baltimore County for a compensable permanent partial disability of less than a specified number of weeks; and applying the Act only prospectively.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {973894/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-1)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/07/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2014 2/06/2014 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/07/2014 2/07/2014 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/12/2014 3/13/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Favorable with Amendments {973894/1 Report Adopted 46
House 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Third Reading Passed (134-1) 47
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 First Reading Finance 47
Senate 3/19/2014 3/19/2014 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/25/2014 3/25/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/25/2014 3/25/2014 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/07/2014 4/07/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-628, 9-629 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM