Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment - Equal Pay for Equal Work
Sponsored by
Delegates Valderrama, Anderson, Angel, Atterbeary, Aumann, Barkley, B. Barnes, D. Barnes, Barron, Beidle, Brooks, Campos, Carr, Carter, Clippinger, Cullison, Dumais, Ebersole, Fennell, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frick, Frush, Gaines, Gilchrist, Glenn, Gutierrez, Haynes, Healey, Hettleman, Hill, C. Howard, Jameson, Jones, Kaiser, Kelly, Korman, Lafferty, Lam, Lierman, Lisanti, Luedtke, McCray, A. Miller, Moon, Morales, Oaks, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Platt, Reznik, B. Robinson, S. Robinson, Rosenberg, Smith, Tarlau, Vaughn, Waldstreicher, A. Washington, M. Washington, K. Young, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering a specified provision of law concerning equal pay for equal work to prohibit discrimination on the basis of gender identity; prohibiting an employer from discriminating between employees in any occupation by providing less favorable employment opportunities based on sex or gender identity; prohibiting an employer from taking specified actions concerning the disclosure or discussion of an employee's wages; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0424
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/13/2015 2/13/2015 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/27/2015 3/30/2015 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-304, 3-304.1, 3-306, 3-307, 3-308 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM