Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Child Abuse - Failure to Report - Penalties and Task Force
Sponsored by
Delegates McComas, Afzali, Aumann, Frank, George, McDonough, Schulz, and Stocksdale
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Making it a misdemeanor, subject to specified penalties, for a specified person to knowingly and willfully fail to report child abuse under specified circumstances; establishing the Task Force to Study Training for Mandatory Reporters on the Risk Factors, Prevention, Identification, and Reporting of Child Abuse; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; prohibiting a member of the Task Force from receiving specified compensation, but authorizing the reimbursement of specified expenses; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0210
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014, June 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2014 2/06/2014 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/06/2014 2/06/2014 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/07/2014 2/07/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 2/07/2014 2/07/2014 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2014 3/10/2014 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-602.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM