Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Leased Residential Property Registry
Sponsored by
Delegate Brooks
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation to establish and maintain an online Leased Residential Property Registry for certain property; establishing that the Department is not responsible for the accuracy of certain information; requiring a landlord to submit a certain registration under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Real Property - Leased Residential Property Registry
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2019
Legislative Date
2/27/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Real Property - Leased Residential Property Registry
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/27/2019 2/27/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-901 through 8-904 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM