Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Queen Anne's County
Sponsored by
Queen Anne's County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 58
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring membership in the Correctional Officers' Retirement System for certain local detention center officers of Queen Anne's County under certain circumstances; providing that a certain individual is entitled to eligibility service and creditable service that was earned before the effective date of Queen Anne's County's participation in the Correctional Officers' Retirement System; providing for the transfer of creditable service for a certain individual; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0636
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Queen Anne's County
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Queen Anne's County
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 8:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (41-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 58
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Queen Anne's County
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Queen Anne's County
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 47
Text - Third - Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Queen Anne's County
House 3/18/2019 3/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 49
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Referred Budget and Taxation 48
Senate 3/20/2019 3/20/2019 Hearing 3/28 at 8:30 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 59
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Third Reading Passed (41-0) 60
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Returned Passed 60
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 58
Text - Chapter - Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Queen Anne's County
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM