Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Montgomery County - Sale of Alcoholic Beverages - Distance From Places of Worship, Schools, and Youth Centers MC 18-16
Sponsored by
Montgomery County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 292
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing provisions of law prohibiting the Montgomery County Board of License Commissioners from approving an application for a license to sell alcoholic beverages within a specified distance of a place of worship, an elementary or secondary school, or a specified youth center; and repealing provisions of law that authorize the Board of License Commissioners to approve an application for a license to sell alcoholic beverages more than a specified distance away from specified locations under specified circumstances.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {453594/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/26/2016
Legislative Date
4/26/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 292
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2016 2/11/2016 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/11/2016 2/11/2016 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2016 3/08/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Favorable with Amendments {453594/1 Report Adopted 41
House 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41
House 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 43
Senate 3/14/2016 3/14/2016 First Reading Finance 43
Senate 3/15/2016 3/15/2016 Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 44
Senate 3/17/2016 3/17/2016 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/06/2016 4/07/2016 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 61A
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Second Reading Passed 61A
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63A
House 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 4/26/2016 4/26/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 292
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM