Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority Police - Collective Bargaining - Binding Arbitration
Sponsored by
Delegates Olszewski, Barnes, Cane, Clippinger, Cluster, DeBoy, Griffith, Guzzone, Howard, Jones, K. Kelly, Lafferty, McDermott, McHale, Minnick, Mitchell, Oaks, Proctor, Reznik, Sophocleus, Vallario, Walker, Weir, and Wilson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Maryland Transportation Authority or the exclusive representative of Maryland Transportation Authority police officers at the rank of first sergeant and below to declare a collective bargaining impasse under specified circumstances; requiring the parties to select an arbitrator; establishing a process for selecting the arbitrator; requiring the arbitrator to direct the parties to submit specified memoranda; requiring the arbitrator to hold a closed hearing and issue a specified report; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2014 2/06/2014 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2014 3/10/2014 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM