Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commercial Law - Cigarette Sales Below Cost - Wholesale Markup
Sponsored by
Delegates Jameson, Feldman, and Love
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the presumptive cost of doing business used to determine the basic cost of cigarettes to a cigarette wholesaler for purposes of provisions of law governing the sale of cigarettes below cost; authorizing a wholesaler to implement a wholesale markup that is less than a specified amount under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0425
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1200 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/05/2013 3/05/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 3/06/2013 3/07/2013 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-501, 11-503 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM