Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
General Assembly - Filling of Vacancy
Sponsored by
Delegates Vitale, Aumann, Metzgar, and Shoemaker
Status
In the House - Hearing cancelled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Proposing an amendment to the Maryland Constitution to provide that a vacancy occurring in the House of Delegates or the Senate of Maryland during a specified period of the term of office shall be filled at the next ensuing regular presidential and congressional election; establishing procedures for the election; submitting this amendment to the qualified voters of the State of Maryland for their adoption or rejection; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Constitutional Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Contingency - on a referendum
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/02/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/02/2015 3/02/2015 Hearing cancelled
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
2/16/2015 Text - First - General Assembly - Filling of Vacancy
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM