Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of the Environment - End-of-Life Management of Mattresses - Study
Sponsored by
Delegates Hill, Atterbeary, Branch, Brooks, Cassilly, Cullison, Ebersole, Kelly, Krebs, Lam, Lisanti, McComas, McCray, McDonough, W. Miller, Moon, Morhaim, Mosby, Pendergrass, Reilly, Robinson, Waldstreicher, M. Washington, West, and Wivell
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of the Environment to study, identify, and make recommendations regarding specified matters that relate to the end-of-life management of mattresses in the State; requiring the Department to consult with specified State agencies and specified persons in carrying out specified activities; and requiring the Department to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and to specified committees of the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2017.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters
Text - First - Department of the Environment - End-of-Life Management of Mattresses - Study
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/18/2017 3/18/2017 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-1702, 9-1707, 9-1733, 9-1734 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM